Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 58, nays 40. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/14/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Reported with amendments (16-2).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|