House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title, reconsidered, returned to the calendar, under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 64, nays 28. The bill, not having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, failed to pass. Motion to reconsider pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2019
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/19.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2019
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|