House
|
06/11/2019
|
Effective date: 08/01/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2019
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 246.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/04/19.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2019
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2019
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2019
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2019
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2019
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2019
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|