House
|
06/02/2019
|
Involuntarily deferred in committee.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2019
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/29/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2019
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2019
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2019
|
Reported favorably (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2019
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2019
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2019
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2019
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2019
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2019
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|