House | 05/01/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 04/30/2019 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/29/2019 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2019 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2019 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2019 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2019 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |