Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2019.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 100, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
House conferees appointed: Edmonds, Garofalo, and Bacala.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2019
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Martiny, Peacock, and Appel.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2019
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2019
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2019
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2019
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2019
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/04/19.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2019
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2019
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Read by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2019
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2019
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2019
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|