Senate | 05/08/2019 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/22/2019. | ||
House | 04/16/2019 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 04/16/2019 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2019 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 04/15/2019 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 04/10/2019 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2019 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time by title and adopted by a vote of 30 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |