Senate | 06/06/2019 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/7/2019. | ||
House | 06/04/2019 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 06/04/2019 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2019 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 06/03/2019 | Read by title, concurred in by vote of 98 yeas, 0 nays. | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/19. | ||
House | 05/30/2019 | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/29/2019 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 05/28/2019 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/23/2019 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2019 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2019 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2019 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | ||
Senate | 05/13/2019 | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |