Senate | 06/18/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2020 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 06/16/2020 | Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 1. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 06/11/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/16/20. | ||
House | 06/11/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/10/2020 | Reported favorably (13-0-1). | ||
House | 06/05/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. |