House | 06/25/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/23/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/22/2020 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/18/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/22/20. | ||
House | 06/18/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/17/2020 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 06/15/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |