Senate
|
06/30/2020
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 7/1/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/29/2020
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2020
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2020
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2020
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/24/2020
|
Read by title, amended, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/24/20.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/23/2020
|
Discharged from the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/22/2020
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
06/18/2020
|
Reported with amendments (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2020
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2020
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2020
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|