House | 10/23/2020 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 10/22/2020 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 10/22/2020 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 10/22/2020 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 10/22/2020 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 10/22/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
Senate | 10/21/2020 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 10/15/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. | ||
Senate | 10/14/2020 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 10/14/2020 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 101, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 10/13/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 10/14/20. | ||
House | 10/13/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 10/12/2020 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 09/28/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |