House
|
10/19/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 48, nays 49. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2020
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/19/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
10/15/2020
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 10/15/20.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
10/14/2020
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2020
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/12/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/07/2020
|
Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
10/06/2020
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|