House
|
06/11/2020
|
Effective date: 08/01/2020.
|
|
|
House
|
06/11/2020
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 186.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 76, nays 20, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 72, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Reported favorably (10-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|