Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 4. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Reported without amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2020
|
Reported with amendments (17-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2020
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|