House | 05/07/2020 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 03/16/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/20. | ||
House | 03/12/2020 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 03/12/2020 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 03/12/2020 | Reported with amendments (13-0). | ||
House | 03/09/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/14/2020 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/14/2020. | ||
House | 02/14/2020 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 02/14/2020 | Prefiled. |