Senate | 05/18/2020 | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 05/15/2020 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 81, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/15/20. | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/07/2020 | Reported favorably (13-0). | ||
House | 05/04/2020 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/31/2020 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |