Senate
|
06/15/2020
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read. (See 2020 1ES journal for Veto Message)
|
|
|
House
|
06/15/2020
|
Veto message received and read. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2020
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2020
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 31 yeas and 3 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Notice House approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2020
|
By a vote of 94 yeas, 0 nays, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, the House approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2020
|
Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2020
|
Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2020
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Reported with amendments (21-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported with amendments (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2020
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2020
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|