Senate
|
06/01/2020
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 16 yeas and 18 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2020
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2020
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2020
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2020
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2020
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2020
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 73, nays 14. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/20.
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2020
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2020
|
Reported favorably (13-0-1).
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2020
|
Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|