Senate | 05/22/2020 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2020 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/21/2020 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 97, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/21/20. | ||
House | 05/20/2020 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/18/2020 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 05/13/2020 | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |