House
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Fields, Talbot, and Mizell.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice of change in House Conference Committee membership.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice of change in House conferees: Turner,Bishop, Schexnayder.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/09/2021
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
House conferees appointed: Turner, Wright, and Schexnayder.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2021
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2021
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/08/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 30 yeas and 8 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 19 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2021
|
Reported favorably (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2021
|
Discharged from the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|