House
|
06/21/2021
|
Effective date: 08/01/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2021
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 426.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2021
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/10/2021
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/11/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
06/10/2021
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2021
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 7 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2021
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2021
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2021
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2021
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2021
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2021
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2021
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 13. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2021
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2021
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2021
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2021
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2021
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|