Senate | 05/17/2021 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2021. | ||
House | 05/06/2021 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2021 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2021 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/04/2021 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2021 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2021 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 04/12/2021 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. |