House
|
05/25/2022
|
Effective date: 08/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 149.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2022
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/19/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2022
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2022
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 03/29/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2022
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|