House | 05/04/2022 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 05/04/2022 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2022. | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Notice given. | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2022. | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/02/2022 | Prefiled. |