Senate | 04/27/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/26/2022 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 98, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/20/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2022. | ||
House | 04/18/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Reported with amendments (9-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2022. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 03/04/2022 | Prefiled. |