Senate | 05/25/2022 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2022 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/24/2022 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 16. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2022. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 05/23/2022 | Reported with amendments (14-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/18/2022 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/18/2022. | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Prefiled. |