Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2022
|
Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|