Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Effective date 6/18/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 658.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 5. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|