House
|
06/05/2022
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Reported with amendments (6-2-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 31 yeas and 4 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|