House
|
06/05/2022
|
Notice Senate approved consideration after the 82nd calendar day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2022
|
Read by title. The Senate approved consideration after 6:00 p.m. on the 82nd calendar day by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/25/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2022
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2022
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Reported with amendments (11-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2022
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|