Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Effective date 8/1/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 426.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2022
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 12. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2022
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2022
|
Discharged from the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2022
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2022
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2022
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2022
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|