Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2022.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2022.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2022
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Read by title, concurred in by vote of 99 yeas, 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2022
|
Discharged from the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2022
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2022
|
Received in the House from the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2022
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered engrossed and sent to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2022
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2022
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|