Louisiana 2022 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR11

Introduced
3/21/22  
Passed
3/23/22  

Caption

Designates Wednesday, April 13, 2022, as Children's Advocacy Centers (CACs) Day in Louisiana.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR18

Designates Monday, April 14, 2025, as Better Together-Children's Advocacy Centers and Court Appointed Special Advocate Day in Louisiana.

LA HR46

Designates April 13, 2022, as Child Advocacy Center Day in Louisiana

LA HB313

Exempts purchases made by child advocacy centers from state and local sales and use taxes

LA SR13

Designates Monday, April 19, 2021, as Child Advocacy Center (CAC) Day in Louisiana.

LA HR119

Designates April 26, 2018, as Children's Advocacy Centers Day

LA HB1061

Provides relative to legal representation for children and indigent parents in child protection cases

LA SR37

Designates Thursday, April 27, 2023, as Child Advocacy Center (CAC) Day in Louisiana.

LA SR13

Designates Thursday, April 11, 2024, as Child Advocacy Center Day in Louisiana.