LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SR11
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SR11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2022 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SR11
Action History
Senate
04/04/2022
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate and sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 3/31/2022.
Senate
03/23/2022
Read by title and adopted.
Senate
03/23/2022
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
Senate
03/22/2022
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Senate
03/21/2022
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.