House
|
05/30/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/30/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/22/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|