House
|
06/06/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/07/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported with amendments (10-2-1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|