Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 22. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/26/2023. | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported favorably (10-0). | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/3/2023. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment. | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Prefiled. |