House
|
06/08/2023
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 06/06/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Scheduled for concurrence on 05/31/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2023
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported favorably (12-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|