House | 05/23/2023 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2023 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 97, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2023. | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |