LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR222
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR222
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2023 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR222
Action History
House
06/05/2023
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
House
06/02/2023
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
House
06/01/2023
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0. The resolution was adopted.
House
05/31/2023
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2023.
House
05/30/2023
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.