LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HSR4
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HSR4
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2023 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HSR4
Action History
House
06/01/2023
Approved on 6/1/2023.
House
05/30/2023
Study request list distributed to members on 5/30/2023.
House
05/25/2023
Received on 5/25/2023.