House | 05/01/2023 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Environmental Quality. |