Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Veto message from the Governor received and read.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2023
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2023
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 70, nays 34. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
By a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2023
|
Notice of Senate rejecting Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2023
|
Conference Committee Report read; failed to be adopted by a vote of 24 yeas and 12 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Seabaugh, Marino, and LaCombe.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Cathey, Talbot, and Smith.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2023
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2023
|
Rules suspended. Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2023
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 33. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/04/2023
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2023.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2023
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2023
|
Reported favorably (9-4). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 13 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|