Louisiana 2023 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SB159 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version

                            2023 Regular Session	ENROLLED
SENATE BILL NO. 159
BY SENATOR CATHEY 
Prefiled pursuant to Article III, Section 2(A)(4)(b)(i) of the Constitution of Louisiana.
1	AN ACT
2 To amend and reenact Children's Code Art. 804(1), relative to juvenile court jurisdiction; 
3 to provide relative to the definition of "child" for purposes of delinquency proceedings; and
4 to provide for related matters.
5 Section 1. Children's Code Art. 804(1) is hereby amended and reenacted to read as
6 follows:
7 Art. 804. Definitions
8	As used in this Title:
9	(1)(a)"Child" Before March 1, 2019, "child" means any person under the
10 age of twenty-one, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act
11 before attaining seventeen years of age.
12	(b) Beginning From March 1, 2019, and through June 30, 2020, "child"
13 means any person under the age of twenty-one, including an emancipated minor,
14 who commits a delinquent act on or after March 1, 2019, through June 30, 2020,
15 when the act is not a crime of violence as defined in R.S. 14:2, and occurs before the
16 person attains eighteen years of age.
17	(c)(i) After June 30, 2020, From July 1, 2020, through July 31, 2023,
18 "child" means any person under the age of twenty-one, including an emancipated
19 minor, who commits a delinquent act on or after July 1, 2020, through July 31,
20 2023, and before the person attains eighteen years of age.
21	(ii) Notwithstanding Item (i) of this Subparagraph, a child who has attained
22 the age of seventeen shall be subject to criminal jurisdiction pursuant to Article 305
23 or 857.
Page 1 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions. SB NO. 159	ENROLLED
1	(d) Beginning August 1, 2023, "child" means any person under the age
2 of twenty-one, including an emancipated minor, who commits a delinquent act
3 on or after August 1, 2023, when the act is not a crime of violence as defined in
4 R.S. 14:2, and the act occurs before the person attains eighteen years of age.
5	(e) "Child" includes any person alleged to have committed any
6 delinquent act prior to his seventeenth birthday.
7	*          *          *
PRESIDENT OF THE SENATE
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
GOVERNOR OF THE STATE OF LOUISIANA
APPROVED:                          
Page 2 of 2
Coding: Words which are struck through are deletions from existing law;
words in boldface type and underscored are additions.