Senate | 05/18/2023 | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/15/2023 | Signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Received from the House without amendments. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Received in the House from the Senate. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2023 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |