Senate
|
05/15/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 70, nays 24. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|