Senate | 05/15/2024 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/13/2024 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 4. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/13/2024. | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Prefiled. |