Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 60, nays 39. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2024
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/08/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2024
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/07/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/06/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/30/2024.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported favorably (14-4).
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|