LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB942
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HB942
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2024 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HB942
Action History
House
04/15/2024
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
04/11/2024
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024.
House
04/09/2024
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
04/08/2024
Reported favorably (8-0).
House
04/03/2024
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
House
04/02/2024
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.